CA SB332 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 100508 of the Government Code, relating to health care coverage, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Health Benefit Exchange: records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 332 Emmerson Consent Calendar Second Day By CONWAY (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB332 Emmerson Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Health to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB332 Emmerson Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 446, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2976.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2513.) |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HEALTH. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1683.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1450.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Set for hearing June 12. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 10230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 100508 | Amended Code | Citation Text |