CA SB323 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6361 of, and to add Section 23701.3 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxes: exemptions: prohibited discrimination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Lara (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Lara (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Eggman. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on JUD.) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2503.) Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1152.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 484.) (April 10). |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23701.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6361 | Amended Code | Citation Text |