CA SB323 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2013-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Eggman.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 6361 of, and to add Section 23701.3 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxes: exemptions: prohibited discrimination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-21 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB323 Lara (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-12AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Eggman.
2013-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 21).
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-12AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on JUD.) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2503.) Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-17AssemblyReferred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and JUD.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1152.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2013-04-16SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-15SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 484.) (April 10).
2013-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
2013-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23701Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code23701.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6361Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_323&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_bill_20130219_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_bill_20130416_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_bill_20130219_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_bill_20130416_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_bill_20130814_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_vote_20130410_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_vote_20130529_0219PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_vote_20130812_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_vote_20130813_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0301-0350/sb_323_vote_20130821_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback