CA SB310 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2924.26 to, and to add and repeal Section 2924.25 of, the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
Mortgages: foreclosure notices: title companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-22 - Assembly - SB 310 Calderon Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB310 Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB310 Calderon (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2013-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2671.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 948.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7). |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 590.) (April 17). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2924.25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 910 | Amended Code | Citation Text |