CA SB30 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17144.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: cancellation of indebtedness: mortgage debt forgiveness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-12 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Calderon Urgency Clause (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-20 - Senate 3rd Reading SB30 Calderon Lay on Table (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-30AssemblySet, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2013-08-21AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-12AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12).
2013-06-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2013-06-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-06-20SenateAmendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Corbett. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1459.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1459.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-06-04SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-06-03SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-30SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1152.) .
2013-05-28SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 8.
2013-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 290.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2013-02-28SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17144.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_30&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130306_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v96.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130306_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130530_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_bill_20130813_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130313_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130408_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130620_1023AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130620_1030AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_30_vote_20130812_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback