CA SB294 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the heading of Article 7.5 (commencing with Section 4127) of Chapter 9 of Division 2 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4127, 4127.1, 4127.2, and 4400 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Sterile drug products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB294 Emmerson Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 294 Emmerson Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB294 Emmerson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 294 Emmerson Senate Third Reading By QUIRK-SILVA (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Health (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB294 Emmerson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 565, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2286.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 3016.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 2). |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and HEALTH. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1165.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1010.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 15. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 388.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4127.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4127.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |