CA SB285 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 483.013 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to attachment.
Title
Disability benefits: attachment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-08-31 - Senate - Special Consent #17 SB285 Wright (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 285 Wright Senate Third Reading By LIEU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB285 Wright (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 285 Wright Senate Third Reading By LIEU (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - Special Consent #1 SB285 Wright (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-04 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2009-08-31 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2022.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-26 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2666.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-17 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2609.) To third reading. | |
2009-07-06 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |
2009-07-02 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.) | |
2009-05-11 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 625.) To Assembly. | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 586.) | |
2009-04-03 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2009-04-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-03-09 | To Com. on JUD. | |
2009-02-25 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |
2009-02-24 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |