CA SB25 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1164.3 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Agricultural labor relations: dispute resolution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-30 - Assembly - SB 25 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 42 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB25 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 25 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB25 Steinberg (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-30 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB25 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Assembly - SB 25 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 43 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB25 Steinberg (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 5009.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 42. Noes 25. Page 6756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Steinberg. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 25. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 2). |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 291.) (March 13). |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing March 13. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1140.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1164 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1164.11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 1164.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |