CA SB225 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1170 of the Penal Code, relating to imprisonment.
Title
Imprisonment: sentences punishable in state prison.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Mimi Walters [R] |
Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 665.) Reconsideration granted. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |