CA SB210 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on January 30 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-08-29 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 1275 and 1318.1 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure: pretrial release.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-17 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SB210 Hancock (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-29AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
2014-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 6338.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-19AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 17).
2014-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-06-10AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2014-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-01-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 2684.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-01-27SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
2014-01-22SenateSet for hearing January 23.
2014-01-21SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-01-15SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2014-01-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-12-19SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2013-02-21SenateReferred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
2013-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14.
2013-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1270Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1275Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code1318.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_210&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_bill_20130211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_bill_20130211_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_bill_20140127_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_bill_20140611_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_bill_20140822_amended_asm_v96.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_vote_20140114_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_vote_20140121_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_vote_20140123_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_vote_20140130_1011AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0201-0250/sb_210_vote_20140617_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback