CA SB204 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 4076.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Prescription drugs: labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB204 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 204 Corbett Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB204 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 204 Corbett Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 55 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Business, Professions and Consumer Protection (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB204 Corbett (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-27 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4884.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4881.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-23 | Senate | Set for hearing August 26. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4748.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 6295.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 2). |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on B.,P. & C.P.) suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2502.) |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and B.,P. & C.P. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 1112.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 936.) (May 13). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 638.) (April 22). |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4076.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |