CA SB192 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-14 - Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8200, 8201, 8202, 8203, 8203.5, 8204, 8205, 8206, 8208, 8208.1, 8208.5, 8209, 8210, 8211, 8212, 8212.3, 8213, 8214, 8215, 8216, 8220, 8220.1, 8220.5, 8222, 8223, 8225, 8226, 8227, 8232, 8235, 8236.1, 8239, 8244, 8250, 8250.5, 8251, 8252, 8255, 8257, 8258, 8261, 8261.5, 8262, 8263, 8263.2, 8263.3, 8263.4, 8264, 8264.5, 8264.6, 8264.7, 8265, 8266, 8266.1, 8272, 8275, 8276.7, 8277, 8277.8, 8278.3, 8279.1, 8279.3, 8279.4, 8279.5, 8279.7, 8282, 8320, 8321, 8324, 8327, 8328, 8329, 8335.1, 8335.5, 8347, 8347.2, 8347.3, 8347.4, 8350, 8352, 8353, 8354, 8355, 8356, 8357, 8358, 8358.5, 8359.1, 8360, 8360.2, 8400, 8401, 8402, 8406.7, 8447, 8448, 8450, 8493, 8494, 8495, 8495.1, 8498, 8499, 8499.3, and 8499.5 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 8200) of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, Article 9 (commencing with Section 8250), Article 15.2 (commencing with Section 8335), Article 15.4 (commencing with Section 8347), Article 15.5 (commencing with Section 8350), and Article 16 (commencing with Section 8360), of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 8499.3) of Chapter 2.3 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 8231 of, to add Section 8220.6 to, to add Article 5 (commencing with Section 8228) to Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, and to repeal and add Sections 8264.8 and 8360.1 of, the Education Code, relating to early learning and educational support services.
Title
Early learning and educational support services.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB192 Liu (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB192 Liu (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held under submission. |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1171.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1008.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 694.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |