CA SB15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-27 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-27 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1708.8 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 632 and 647 of, and to add Title 14 (commencing with Section 14350) to Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to aviation.
Title
Aviation: unmanned aircraft systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-27 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB15 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB15 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 566.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 14350 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1525 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |