CA SB15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2013-08-27 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1708.8 of the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 632 and 647 of, and to add Title 14 (commencing with Section 14350) to Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to aviation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aviation: unmanned aircraft systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-27 - Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-06-18 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB15 Padilla (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-27AssemblyReconsideration granted.
2013-08-13AssemblySet, second hearing. Failed passage in committee.
2013-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-07-02AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2013-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1109.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-13SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2013-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 755.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2013-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 566.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-04-03SenateRe-referred to Coms. on JUD. and PUB. S.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1708.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code14350New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1525Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code632Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code647Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_15&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130422_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130612_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130422_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130612_amended_asm_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v94.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_bill_20130806_amended_asm_v93.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130416_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130430_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130513_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130528_0435PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130618_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130813_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_15_vote_20130827_000004_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback