CA SB1485 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-29 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 5.2 (commencing with Section 19990.01) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to Internet gambling, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Internet gambling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1485 Committee on G.O. (Wright) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-06-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. Set for hearing June 29. | |
2010-06-10 | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2010-06-02 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Assembly. Read third time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-05-06 | In Senate. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-06 | Returned to Senate for further action. | |
2010-04-29 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3380.) To Assembly. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-16 | Set for hearing April 26. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3182.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-03-16 | Set for hearing April 13. | |
2010-03-11 | To Com. on G.O. | |
2010-03-09 | From print. May be acted upon on or after April 8. | |
2010-03-08 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |