CA SB1465 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 442, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 442, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8880.5, 14670.3, and 14670.5 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 1728.7, 1797.98b, 127665, and 128225.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend and renumber Section 10961 of the Insurance Code, to amend Sections 308, 667.5, and 3000 of the Penal Code, to amend Section 2356 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 736, 5328.15, 6600, 6601, 6608.7, 6609, 9717, 10600.1, 10725, 14043.26, 14087.36, 14105.192, 14124.5, 14169.51, 14169.52, 14169.53, 14169.55, 14169.56, 14169.58, 14169.59, 14169.61, 14169.63, 14169.65, 14169.66, 14169.72, 14312, 14451, 15657.8, and 16541 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] |
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Mike Morrell [R] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1465 Committee on Health (Hernandez) Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1465 HEALTH Third Reading Urgency By BONTA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1465 Committee on Health (Hernandez) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1465 HEALTH Third Reading Urgency By BONTA (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1465 Committee on Health (Hernandez) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 442, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4671.) |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6168.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 20. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |