CA SB1460 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 772, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 772, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17212 and 17506 of, and to add Section 8707.1 to, the Family Code, to amend Sections 1505 and 1515 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 11170 of, and to add Section 11105.08 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Sections 305.5, 361.2, 361.4, 362.04, 727, 11402, 16002, 16010.6, 16501.3, 16507.5, 16519.5, 17710, and 17732.2 of, and to add Sections 381, 827.15, and 10553.12 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare.
Title
Child welfare.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Tom Berryhill [R] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1460 Committee on HUMAN S. (Beall) Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1460 HUMAN. S. Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1460 Committee on HUMAN S. (Beall) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 1460 HUMAN. S. Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1460 Committee on HUMAN S. (Beall) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 772, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4913.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6452.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3687.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3717.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3214.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 28.) |