CA SB1424 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Title 14.5 (commencing with Section 3085) of Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to the Internet.
Title
Internet: social media: advisory group.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1424 Pan Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1424 Pan Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1424 Pan Senate Third Reading Amend By CHAU Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1424 Pan (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1424 Pan Senate Third Reading By CHAU (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1424 Pan Senate Third Reading Amend By CHAU Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Arts, Entertainment, Sports, Tourism, and Internet Media] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1424 Pan (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2018-09-20 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5871.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6579.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 23. Page 6475.) |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4310.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4997.) (May 8). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3085 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Commercial Code | 1103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |