CA SB1424 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Section 3 of Chapter 815 of the Statutes of 1976, relating to tidelands, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
State property: tidelands transfer: City of Martinez.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1424 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1424 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1424 Wolk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - SB 1424 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1424 Wolk (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4640.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6049.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 (pending re-referral to L. Gov.) suspended. (Page 5488.) |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3694.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3216.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |