CA SB1418 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16773 and 16965 of the Government Code, to amend Section 2103 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 9400.1 and 42205 of, and to repeal Section 9400.4 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicle weight fees: transportation bond debt service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 29). |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16773 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |