CA SB1412 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1367, 1368, 1368.1, 1369, 1369.1, 1370, 1370.01, 1370.1, 1370.5, 1371, 1373, and 1375.5 of, to add Section 1370.02 to, and to repeal Section 1367.1 of, the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Criminal proceedings: mentally incompetent offenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1412 Nielsen Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1412 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Nielsen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1412 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By PATTERSON (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1412 Nielsen (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4758.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6295.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6153.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3612.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3716.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (April 29). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1367 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1367.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1368.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1368.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1369 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1369.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1370.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1370.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1371 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1373 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1375.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |