CA SB14 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 115843.6 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to reservoirs, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bear Lake Reservoir: recreational use.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-15 - Unfinished Business SB14 Gaines Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-08 - SB 14 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-07-03 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Consent Calendar 2nd SB14 Gaines (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 172, Statutes of 2013.
2013-08-27 Approved by the Governor.
2013-08-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
2013-08-15SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1848.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. (Corrected August 19).
2013-08-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-08-08AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-08-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2013-05-09AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2013-04-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-04-18SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 579.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2013-04-15SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2013-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2013-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2013-02-25SenateHearing postponed by committee.
2013-02-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-02-05SenateSet for hearing March 4.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code115843.6Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_14&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130219_amended_sen_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130219_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130610_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130219_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130610_amended_asm_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130816_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_bill_20130827_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130403_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130418_0947AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130618_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130703_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130808_1051AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_14_vote_20130815_1142AM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback