CA SB1377 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3218.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3218.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15819.40 and 15819.403 of the Government Code, relating to corrections, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 3218.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and GOV. & F. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15819.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 15819.403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |