CA SB1372 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-08-28 - Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 17.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 18410.2 and 23151 of, and to add Section 23635 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporation taxes: tax rates: publicly held corporations: credits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 DeSaulnier (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 DeSaulnier Reconsider (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1372 DeSaulnier (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-23 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-28SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 17.)
2014-08-21SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2014-05-28SenateRead third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 17. Page 3667.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator DeSaulnier. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3667.)
2014-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3715.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-16SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-12SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 12.
2014-04-29SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3257.) (April 24).
2014-04-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2014-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2014-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2014-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2014-03-17SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2014-02-24SenateRead first time.
2014-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2014-02-21SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1372&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_bill_20140221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_bill_20140401_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_bill_20140421_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_bill_20140429_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_bill_20140821_amended_sen_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140424_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140512_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140528_0649PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140528_0650PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1351-1400/sb_1372_vote_20140828_0642PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback