CA SB1358 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-19 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 15805 and 50535 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 114276 of, and to add Section 118506 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to public accommodations.
Title
Baby diaper changing stations.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Ellen Corbett [D] | Sen. Alex Padilla [D] |
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 4 SB1358 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1358 Wolk Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Wolk (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1358 Wolk Senate Third Reading By GARCIA (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1358 Wolk (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-19 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-19 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 4993.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 6715.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6550.) |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. (Page 6317.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.) Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6). |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 3533.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3504.) (May 19). |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 3314.) (April 29). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 15805 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 50535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 114276 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 118506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 18941.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |