CA SB1353 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 51244.3 of, to amend and repeal Sections 16142, 16142.1, and 51244 of, and to repeal Section 51244.4 of, the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: Williamson Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1353 Nielsen Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1353 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By OLSEN (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1353 Nielsen (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1353 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By OLSEN (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Agriculture (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1353 Nielsen (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 322, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4605.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6124.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and AGRI. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3326.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3278.) (April 28). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3038.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16142 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16142.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51244 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51244.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |