CA SB1270 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-11 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 607, 677, 2006, 2207, 2208, 2209, 2210, 2732.5, 2733, 2770, 2770.6, 2772, 2773.1, 2774, 2774.1, 2774.3, and 2774.4 of, and to add Section 2006.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to mining.
Title
Surface mining operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Held in committee and under submission. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3296.) (April 29). |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |