CA SB1266 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4119.2 of the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Section 49414 of the Education Code, relating to pupil health.
Title
Pupil health: epinephrine auto-injectors.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1266 Huff Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1266 Huff Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1266 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1266 Huff Senate Third Reading By BUCHANAN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Education (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1266 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Health (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 321, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6545.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6284.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3713.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 29). |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3280.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in JUD. pending receipt. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in HEALTH pending receipt. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (April 2). |
2014-03-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing March 26. Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., HEALTH, and JUD. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4119.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 49414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |