CA SB1245 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1901 and 1903 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Dental Hygiene Committee of California.
Title
The Dental Hygiene Committee of California.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Asm. Susan Bonilla [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1245 Lieu Senate Third Reading By BONILLA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1245 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 396, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6412.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3607.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3712.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3279.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 1901 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 1903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |