CA SB1236 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 830.14 of the Penal Code, and to amend Section 99170 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to transit districts.
Title
Transit districts: transit offenses and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1236 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB1236 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - Senate - Special Consent #13 SB1236 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 253, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5916.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3417.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3237.) (April 22). |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 830.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 98120 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 99170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |