CA SB1227 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 29 2012 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-16 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19614 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Horse racing: parimutuel pool funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-28 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1227 Negrete McLeod (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-16 Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2012-08-08 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-06-28 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-29 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3643.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-25 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-24 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3593.) (May 24).
2012-05-18 Set for hearing May 24.
2012-04-30 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2012-04-20 Set for hearing April 30.
2012-03-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3021.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-03-20 Set for hearing March 27.
2012-03-08 Referred to Com. on G.O.
2012-02-24 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
2012-02-23 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19614Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback