CA SB1220 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 12 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-06-25 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22109.5, 22115, 22119.3, 22121, 22131, 22134, 22134.5, 22135, 22136, 22146.2, 22516, 22655, 22662, 22663, 22664, 22801, 22826, 22828, 22905, 22909, 23104, 24001, 24101, 24105, 24107, 24201.5, 24203.5, 24203.6, 24204, 24205, 24210, 24211, 24212, 24213, 24214.5, 24300, 24300.1, 24307, 24309, 24310, 24402, 24412, 24415, 24600, 25015, 25100, 26113, 26703, 26704, 26803, 27201, and 33050 of, to amend and renumber Sections 22106.2, 24300.2, 24300.5, 24300.6, 24301, 24302, 24303, 24304, 24305, 24305.5, 24306, 24306.5, 24306.7, 24308, 24311, 24312, 24312.1, and 24313 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 22106.1 of, to amend and repeal Section 22119.5 of, to amend, renumber, and repeal Section 24305.3 of, and to add Sections 24347, 24348, 25011.6, 25018.6, and 26807.7 to, the Education Code, and to amend Section 1 of Chapter 559 of the Statutes of 2013, relating to state teachers' retirement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State teachers' retirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-25 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Torres (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
2014-05-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
2014-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-05-12SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3436.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 5).
2014-04-25SenateSet for hearing May 5.
2014-04-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3216.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2014-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 21.
2014-03-06SenateReferred to Com. on P.E. & R.
2014-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2014-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code22106.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code22109.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22115Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22119.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22119.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22121Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22131Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22134Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22134.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22135Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22136Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22146.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22516Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22655Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22662Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22663Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22664Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22801Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22826Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22828Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22905Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code22909Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code23104Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24001Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24101Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24105Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24107Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24201.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24203.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24203.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24204Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24205Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24210Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24211Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24212Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24213Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24214.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24300Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24300.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24307Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24309Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24310Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24402Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24412Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24415Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code24600Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code25015Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code25100Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code26113Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code26703Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code26704Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code26803Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code27201Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code33050Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1220&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20140220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20140410_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_bill_20140612_amended_asm_v97.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20140421_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20140505_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20140512_0327PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_1201-1250/sb_1220_vote_20140625_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback