CA SB1176 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-21 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.0061 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10112.281 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: cost sharing: monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1176 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1176 Steinberg (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-12 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member V. Manuel Pérez. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 17). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 3605.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3711.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 24). |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.0061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.281 | New Code | See Bill Text |