CA SB1175 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35401.5 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: length limitations: motorsports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB1175 Walters Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1175 Walters Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1175 Walters (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 1175 Walters Senate Third Reading By MELENDEZ (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1175 Walters (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 786, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6424.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3604.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3711.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3387.) (May 6). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 35401.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |