CA SB1172 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 15 (commencing with Section 865) to Chapter 1 of Division 2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexual orientation change efforts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-30 - Unfinished Business SB1172 Lieu (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - SB 1172 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MA (Y: 52 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-05 - SB 1172 Lieu Senate Third Reading By MA Amend By MA Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1172 Lieu (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - Do pass (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 835, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
2012-08-30 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5022.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-28 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 22. Page 6465.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-13 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-09 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 8).
2012-08-06 Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5751.)
2012-07-05 Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 5604.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-27 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 26).
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-30 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-29 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-25 Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-05-10 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-09 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3459.) (May 8).
2012-05-02 Set for hearing May 8.
2012-04-30 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-04-25 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-04-24 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3259.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-04-16 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2012-04-13 Set for hearing April 23.
2012-04-12 Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
2012-04-09 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-03-01 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2012-02-23 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2012-02-22 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code865New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code1733Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1172&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120222_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120409_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120416_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120425_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120430_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120525_amended_sen_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120705_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120905_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_bill_20120930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120423_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120508_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120530_0254PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120626_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120705_0227PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120808_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120828_0459PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1151-1200/sb_1172_vote_20120830_0429PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback