CA SB115 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-08-22 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1759 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities Commission: Bagley-Keene Open Meeting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-06 - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - Be referred to Committee on Utilities and Commerce (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate 3rd Reading SB115 Hill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
2014-08-14AssemblyFrom consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2014-08-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 6).
2014-06-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
2014-06-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2014-06-09AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-08-13AssemblySet, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
2013-07-02AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-18AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-05AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-04-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 674.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 567.) (April 16).
2013-04-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2013-03-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2013-01-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code7630Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code125290.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25711.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code1759Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_115&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130116_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130313_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130408_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130408_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130116_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20130313_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20140609_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_bill_20140822_amended_asm_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_vote_20130416_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_vote_20130425_0931AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_vote_20140612_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_vote_20140623_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_115_vote_20140806_000001_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback