CA SB113 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2102, 2106, 2150, 2156, 2205, and 2220 of, and to add Section 2155.3 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: voter registration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-08-26 - Unfinished Supp 1 SB113 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - SB 113 Jackson Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 54 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate 3rd Reading SB113 Jackson (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2014.
2014-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2014-09-02SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
2014-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2014-08-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 21. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate.
2014-08-19AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 6154.) Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-08-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 6).
2014-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24).
2014-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-06-10AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2014-04-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2014-01-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2014-01-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 2662.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2014-01-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-01-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23).
2014-01-21SenateSet for hearing January 23.
2014-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-23SenateHeld in committee and under submission.
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2013-04-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 388.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 2.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2013-01-16SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16.
2013-01-15SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2102Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2106Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2150Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2155Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2155.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Elections Code2156Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2205Repealed CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2220Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_113&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20130115_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20130115_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140106_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140617_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140701_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140819_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140828_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_bill_20140926_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20130402_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20130415_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140123_000004_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140128_1026AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140624_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140806_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140825_0255PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_113_vote_20140826_0717PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback