CA SB1129 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33130, 34167.5, 34171, 34177, 34177.5, 34179, 34180, 34191.4, and 34191.5 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to redevelopment.
Title
Redevelopment: successor agencies to redevelopment agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1129 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1129 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1129 Steinberg (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1129 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1129 Steinberg (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4967.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 6575.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6345.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 3670.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3709.) (May 23). |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 5. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3119.) (April 9). |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected March 12.) |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 33130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34167.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34171 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34177.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34178.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34179 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34180 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34191.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34191.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 34191.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |