CA SB1117 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on September 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 14036 and 14522 of the Government Code, and to add Section 185033.1 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Passenger rail: planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-29 - Unfinished Business SB1117 DeSaulnier Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - SB 1117 DeSaulnier Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1117 DeSaulnier (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-29 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2012-09-29 Vetoed by the Governor.
2012-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2012-08-29 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 4959.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-24 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-23 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6196.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-21 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-08-16 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2012-08-08 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-07-05 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected July 6.)
2012-07-03 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (July 2).
2012-06-26 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-06-25 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on TRANS.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-30 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 3693.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-25 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-24 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3590.) (May 24).
2012-05-18 Set for hearing May 24.
2012-05-14 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2012-05-04 Set for hearing May 14.
2012-05-01 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-30 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (April 24).
2012-04-10 Set for hearing April 24.
2012-03-29 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-03-01 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-02-21 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2012-02-17 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14036Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14521.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14522Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code14537New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code185033.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1117&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120217_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120329_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120501_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120626_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120705_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120820_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120424_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120514_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120524_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120530_1111AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120702_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120816_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120823_0117PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1101-1150/sb_1117_vote_20120829_0559PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback