CA SB1064 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 3040 of the Family Code, to amend Sections 1510 and 1514 of the Probate Code, and to amend Sections 309, 361, 361.2, 361.3, 361.4, 361.5, 366.21, 366.215, 366.22, 366.25, 366.27, 388, and 16501.1 of, and to add Sections 10609.95 and 10609.97 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child custody.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child custody: immigration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-29 - Unfinished Business SB1064 De León Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-28 - SB 1064 De Leon Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-08-24 - SB 1064 De Leon Senate Third Reading By MITCHELL Amend By MITCHELL Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Human Services (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB1064 De León (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 845, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
2012-08-29 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 4. Page 4969.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-28 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-28 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 6. Page 6448.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-08-24 Assembly Rule 69 suspended. (Page 6273.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 6275.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-20 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-16 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2012-08-08 Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-06-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-19 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2012-06-07 Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
2012-05-30 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2012-05-29 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3646.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2012-05-25 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-24 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3590.) (May 24).
2012-05-18 Set for hearing May 24.
2012-05-14 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2012-05-04 Set for hearing May 14.
2012-04-25 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-17 Set for hearing April 24.
2012-04-16 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-03-27 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2012-03-19 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2012-03-02 Set for hearing March 27.
2012-03-01 Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
2012-02-14 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2012-02-13 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Code3040Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code1510Amended CodeCitation Text
Probate Code1514Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10609.95New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10609.97New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code16501.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code309Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.2Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.4Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code361.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code366.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code366.215Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code366.22Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code366.25Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code366.27Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code388Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1064&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120213_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120319_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120416_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120824_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120930_chaptered.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_bill_20120930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120327_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120424_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120514_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120524_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120529_0152PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120619_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120626_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120816_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120824_1153AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120828_0236PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1064_vote_20120829_0659PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback