CA SB1054 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6032, 6045, 6045.4, and 6045.8 of the Penal Code, relating to mentally ill criminal offenders.
Title
Mentally ill offender crime reduction grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Steinberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1054 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1054 Steinberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1054 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1054 Steinberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Budget and Fiscal Review (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 436, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4687.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6239.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3669.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3708.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.R. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and B. & F.R. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 6032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 6045.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6045.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |