CA SB105 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 12 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 19050.2 and 19050.8 of the Government Code, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 1233.1, 1233.3, 1233.4, 2910, 11191, and 13602 of, to add Section 1233.9 to, and to add and repeal Sections 2915 and 6250.2 of, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 15 of Chapter 42 of the Statutes of 2012, relating to corrections, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corrections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - SB 105 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Unfinished Supp 1 SB105 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-29 - Do pass as amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate 3rd Reading SB105 Committee on B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 310, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-12 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-12SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
2013-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2349.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3172.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-10AssemblyWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-09AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 2948.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 23. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2013-08-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2013-05-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-13SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 901.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2013-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected May 9).

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code15Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code19050.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code19050.8New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code2012Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code42Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code11191New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1233.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1233.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code1233.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code13602New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code2910New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_105&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130110_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130110_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130827_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130903_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130906_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130909_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130911_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_bill_20130912_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_vote_20130513_0153PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_vote_20130829_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_vote_20130911_0420PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_105_vote_20130911_1052AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback