CA SB1040 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-25 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 110663 to, and to add Article 6.6 (commencing with Section 110808) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of Division 104 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to genetically engineered food. .
Title
Food labeling: genetically engineered food.
Sponsors
Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Mark DeSaulnier [D] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1040 Evans (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-25 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5645.) |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3328.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3091.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 25237 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 110663 | New Code | See Bill Text |