CA SB1015 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend and repeal Section 2690 of the Penal Code, relating to inmates, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Inmates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1015 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - SB 1015 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1015 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - SB 1015 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1015 Galgiani Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 193, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4292.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5705.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18). |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3325.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3277.) (April 28). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3217.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 131000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2690 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |