CA SB1007 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-20 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-20 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 10 (commencing with Section 52495) to Chapter 9 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to career technical education.
Title
Career technical education.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52495 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |