CA SB1006 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-08-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51225.3, 60850, and 60851 of, and to add Section 51008.5 to, the Education Code, relating to school curriculum.
Title
School curriculum: American history and government: high school graduation course requirements: high school exit examination.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Wyland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51008.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 51225.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 60851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |