CA SB1005 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 13 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-23 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Title 22.5 (commencing with Section 100530) to the Government Code, to add Section 1366.7 to the Health and Safety Code, to add Section 10112.31 to the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14102.1 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care coverage: immigration status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-19 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-23SenateHeld in committee and under submission.
2014-05-20SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2014-05-19SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2014-05-09SenateSet for hearing May 19.
2014-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3343.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2014-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2014-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2014-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2014-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2014-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code100530New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code1366.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Insurance Code10112.31New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14102.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback