CA AR43 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5642.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5642.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, and Transgender (LGBT) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 5642.). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |