CA AJR45 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sexual assault forensic exams.
Title
Sexual assault forensic exams: federal funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Mark Leno [D] | Sen. Andy Vidak [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-05 - Senate - Special Consent #16 AJR45 Skinner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AJR 45 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AJR 45 SKINNER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 62, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3758.) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4994.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read and amended. (Page 4944.) |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-04-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |