CA ACR94 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-17)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-17)
Status: Passed on May 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: active shooter incidents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR94 Rodriguez By Torres (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3327.) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4236.) |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Read and amended. (Page 4145.) |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-03-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 11). |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |